ID S1394 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Signed by Governor on 03/28/14 Session Law Chapter 291 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Signed by Governor on 03/28/14 Session Law Chapter 291 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends and repeals existing law to increase a certain annual salary amount received by the Chief Justice of the Supreme Court; to increase a certain annual salary amount received by the Administrative Judge; to remove provisions relating to the salaries of judges of the Court of Appeals; to provide a certain annual salary amount received by the Chief Judge of the Court of Appeals; to revise provisions and to establish additional provisions relating to salaries of judges.
Title
Amends and repeals existing law to increase a certain annual salary amount received by the Chief Justice of the Supreme Court; to increase a certain annual salary amount received by the Administrative Judge; to remove provisions relating to the salaries of judges of the Court of Appeals; to provide a certain annual salary amount received by the Chief Judge of the Court of Appeals; to revise provisions and to establish additional provisions relating to salaries of judges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/28/14 Session Law Chapter 291 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/24/14 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2014-03-20 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2014-03-19 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-19 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-19 | House | Moyle |
2014-03-19 | House | 67-1-2 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Boyle, Burgoyne, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Denney, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McDonald, McMillan, Meline, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Morse, Moyle, Nielsen, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rubel, Rusche, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Stevenson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barrett Absent -- Henderson, Thompson Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-19 | House | PASSED |
2014-03-19 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 67 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 3, read three times |
2014-03-19 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-18 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-13 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules, & Administration |
2014-03-13 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2014-03-12 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Davis |
2014-03-12 | Senate | 34-0-1 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Bock, Brackett, Cameron, Davis, Fulcher, Goedde, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Pearce, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Stennett, Thayn, Tippets, Vick, Ward-Engelking, Werk, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Buckner-Webb Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-12 | Senate | PASSED |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |