ID S1393 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Signed by Governor on 03/28/14 Session Law Chapter 290 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Signed by Governor on 03/28/14 Session Law Chapter 290 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals and adds to existing law to provide for the Special Committee on Criminal Justice Reinvestment Oversight and related provisions.
Title
Repeals and adds to existing law to provide for the Special Committee on Criminal Justice Reinvestment Oversight and related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/28/14 Session Law Chapter 290 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/24/14 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2014-03-20 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2014-03-19 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-19 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-19 | House | Wills |
2014-03-19 | House | 67-0-3 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(31), Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Boyle, Burgoyne, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Denney, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McDonald, McMillan, Meline, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Morse, Moyle, Nielsen, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rubel, Rusche, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Stevenson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- None Absent -- Anderson(01), Henderson, Thompson Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-19 | House | PASSED |
2014-03-19 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 67 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 3, read three times |
2014-03-19 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-18 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-13 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules, & Administration |
2014-03-13 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2014-03-12 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Lodge |
2014-03-12 | Senate | 34-0-1 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Bock, Brackett, Cameron, Davis, Fulcher, Goedde, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Pearce, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Stennett, Thayn, Tippets, Vick, Ward-Engelking, Werk, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Buckner-Webb Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-12 | Senate | PASSED |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |