ID S1384 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Signed by Governor on 03/28/14 Session Law Chapter 289 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Signed by Governor on 03/28/14 Session Law Chapter 289 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $51,317,500 to the Department of Health and Welfare for the divisions of Independent Councils, Indirect Support Services, and Licensing and Certification for fiscal year 2015; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 361.40; provides for General Fund transfers to the Cooperative Welfare Fund; restricts the transfer of trustee and benefit payments; limits services to available resources; requires a monthly Medicaid tracking report; requires a quarterly Medicaid Integrity Unit report; requires for quarterly transfer reports, provides legislative intent regarding appropriation by fund; and provides guidance for employee compensation.
Title
Appropriates $51,317,500 to the Department of Health and Welfare for the divisions of Independent Councils, Indirect Support Services, and Licensing and Certification for fiscal year 2015; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 361.40; provides for General Fund transfers to the Cooperative Welfare Fund; restricts the transfer of trustee and benefit payments; limits services to available resources; requires a monthly Medicaid tracking report; requires a quarterly Medicaid Integrity Unit report; requires for quarterly transfer reports, provides legislative intent regarding appropriation by fund; and provides guidance for employee compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/28/14 Session Law Chapter 289 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/18/14 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2014-03-17 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2014-03-13 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-13 | House | PASSED -- 40-27-3 |
2014-03-13 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-03-12 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-11 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-11 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2014-03-10 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-10 | Senate | PASSED -- 27-6-2 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |
Subjects
APPROPRIATIONS
DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND WELFARE
INDEPENDENT COUNCILS/ INDIRECT SUPPORT SERVICES/LICENSING AND CERTIFICATION
DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND WELFARE
INDEPENDENT COUNCILS/ INDIRECT SUPPORT SERVICES/LICENSING AND CERTIFICATION