ID S1370 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Signed by Governor on 04/04/14 Session Law Chapter 348 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Signed by Governor on 04/04/14 Session Law Chapter 348 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law to provide requirements relating to designating a qualified substitute when a legislator is temporarily unable to perform the duties of office.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide requirements relating to designating a qualified substitute when a legislator is temporarily unable to perform the duties of office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 04/04/14 Session Law Chapter 348 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/24/14 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2014-03-20 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2014-03-20 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-20 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-20 | House | PASSED -- 70-0-0 |
2014-03-20 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-03-19 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-18 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-13 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2014-03-13 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Nonini |
2014-03-11 | Senate | 33-0-2 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Bock, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Cameron, Davis, Fulcher, Goedde, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Pearce, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Thayn, Tippets, Vick, Werk, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Stennett, Ward-Engelking Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-11 | Senate | PASSED |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred to 14th Order for amendment |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2014-03-11 | Senate | 03/11 Read third time in full as amended |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |