ID H0132 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - March 30, 2015 Session Law Chapter 175 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - March 30, 2015 Session Law Chapter 175 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR FUELS - Amends existing law to provide for a revised rate of taxation on gaseous special fuels.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for a revised rate of taxation on gaseous special fuels.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | House | March 30, 2015 Session Law Chapter 175 Effective: 07/01/2015 |
2015-03-26 | House | Law without signature |
2015-03-26 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:45 a.m. on March 25, 2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2015-03-23 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2015-03-20 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2015-03-19 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-19 | Senate | PASSED -- 19-16-0 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2015-03-03 | House | to Senate |
2015-03-03 | House | Title apvd |
2015-03-03 | House | PASSED -- 61-9-0 |
2015-03-03 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-03-02 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-02-27 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 2, 2015 |
2015-02-26 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-02-25 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-02-16 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2015-02-13 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |