ID H0580 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-03-28 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2014 Session Law Chapter 323 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $3,616,300 to the Office of Drug Policy for fiscal year 2015; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 6; and provides guidance for employee compensation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $3,616,300 to the Office of Drug Policy for fiscal year 2015; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 6; and provides guidance for employee compensation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-12 - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-28HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2014 Session Law Chapter 323 Effective: 07/01/2014
2014-03-18HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:40 a.m. on March 17, 2014
2014-03-17HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2014-03-14SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2014-03-14SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2014-03-13HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2014-03-13HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2014-03-12Senateto House
2014-03-12SenateTitle apvd
2014-03-12SenatePASSED -- 29-5-1
2014-03-12SenateRead third time in full
2014-03-07SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2014-03-06SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2014-03-06SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
2014-03-06SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2014-03-05Houseto Senate
2014-03-05HouseTitle apvd
2014-03-05HouseBolz
2014-03-05House64-4-2 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(31), Anderst, Andrus, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Boyle, Burgoyne, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Denney, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Harris, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McDonald, Meline, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Morse, Moyle, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rubel, Rusche, Smith, Stevenson, Thompson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barbieri, McMillan, Shepherd, Sims Absent -- Anderson(01), Nielsen Floor Sponsor
2014-03-05HousePASSED
2014-03-05HouseRules Suspended: Ayes 59 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 11, read three times
2014-03-05HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2014-03-04HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2014-03-03HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback