ID H0358 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2014 Session Law Chapter 319 Effective: 01/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2014 Session Law Chapter 319 Effective: 01/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to provide for other entities that must file RBC reports; to provide for other entities subject to a company action level event and to provide additional detail for an RBC plan; to provide for other entities who are subject to action by the director following a mandatory control level event; to clarify the protections afforded confidential RBC documents and information; to provide for another entity to fall within the scope of an exemption and to provide additional guidelines to fall within an exemption.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for other entities that must file RBC reports; to provide for other entities subject to a company action level event and to provide additional detail for an RBC plan; to provide for other entities who are subject to action by the director following a mandatory control level event; to clarify the protections afforded confidential RBC documents and information; to provide for another entity to fall within the scope of an exemption and to provide additional guidelines to fall within an exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2014 Session Law Chapter 319 Effective: 01/01/2015 |
2014-03-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:30 p.m. on March 19, 2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2014-03-18 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2014-03-18 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2014-03-17 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-17 | Senate | PASSED -- 25-10-0 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2014-01-28 | House | to Senate |
2014-01-28 | House | Title apvd |
2014-01-28 | House | PASSED -- 48-20-2 |
2014-01-28 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-01-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-01-24 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-01-15 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Business |
2014-01-14 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |