IA SSB3050 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-22 - In Economic Growth
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-22 - In Economic Growth
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act relating to the administration of the redevelopment tax credits program by the economic development authority and including applicability provisions.
Title
A study bill for an act relating to the administration of the redevelopment tax credits program by the economic development authority and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-22 | Senate | In Economic Growth |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HSB540 (Related) 2014-01-23 - In Economic Growth
HF2287 (Replaced by) 2014-04-01 - Withdrawn. H.J. 627.
SF2256 (Replaced by) 2014-02-26 - Subcommittee, Dotzler, Bertrand, and Black. S.J. 406.
SF2339 (Replaced by) 2014-04-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 769.
HF2455 (Replaced by) 2014-04-01 - Withdrawn. H.J. 627.
HF2287 (Replaced by) 2014-04-01 - Withdrawn. H.J. 627.
SF2256 (Replaced by) 2014-02-26 - Subcommittee, Dotzler, Bertrand, and Black. S.J. 406.
SF2339 (Replaced by) 2014-04-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 769.
HF2455 (Replaced by) 2014-04-01 - Withdrawn. H.J. 627.