IA SSB3050 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2261
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2378
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2378
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2378.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2378.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act modifying provisions related to the time in which the board of educational examiners can investigate complaints relating to licensed school employees having romantic or otherwise inappropriate relationships with students.(See SF 2378.)
Title
A bill for an act modifying provisions related to the time in which the board of educational examiners can investigate complaints relating to licensed school employees having romantic or otherwise inappropriate relationships with students.(See SF 2378.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2378. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2024 12:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Gruenhagen, Cournoyer, and Trone Garriott. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
HSB564 (Related) 2024-02-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2261.
HF2261 (Replaced by) 2024-02-01 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 179.
SF2378 (Replaced by) 2024-03-14 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537.
HF2261 (Replaced by) 2024-02-01 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 179.
SF2378 (Replaced by) 2024-03-14 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3050 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3050.html |