IA SF2355 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 930.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 930.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to matters under the purview of the department of transportation, establishing a fee, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3220.) Various effective dates; see section 25 of bill.
Title
A bill for an act relating to matters under the purview of the department of transportation, establishing a fee, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3220.) Various effective dates; see section 25 of bill.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 930. |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 929. |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 929. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 883. |
2014-04-29 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 842. |
2014-04-29 | House | Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 841. |
2014-04-29 | House | Speaker ruled amendment H-8314 not germane. H.J. 841. |
2014-04-29 | House | Amendment H-8321 lost. H.J. 841. |
2014-04-28 | House | Amendment H-8321 filed. H.J. 831. |
2014-04-25 | House | Amendment H-8314 filed. H.J. 820. |
2014-04-25 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 819. |
2014-04-24 | House | Subcommittee, Moore, Byrnes, and Riding. H.J. 800. |
2014-04-23 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2014-04-23 | House | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 778. |
2014-04-21 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 772. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 816. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 42, nays 6. S.J. 816. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Amendment S-5167 filed, adopted. S.J. 815. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 805. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 805. |