IA SF2342 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 930.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 930.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to certain state departments, agencies, funds, and certain other entities, providing for regulatory authority, and other properly related matters, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3210.) Various effective dates; see sections 24 and 27 of bill.
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to certain state departments, agencies, funds, and certain other entities, providing for regulatory authority, and other properly related matters, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3210.) Various effective dates; see sections 24 and 27 of bill.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 930. |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 929. |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 929. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 907. |
2014-05-01 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 874. |
2014-05-01 | House | Passed House, ayes 56, nays 42. H.J. 873. |
2014-05-01 | House | Conference committee report adopted. H.J. 873. |
2014-05-01 | House | Conference committee report filed. H.J. 872. |
2014-05-01 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 872. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 906. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 21. S.J. 905. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted. S.J. 905. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Conference committee report filed. S.J. 905. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 863. |
2014-04-25 | House | Senate conference committee appointed, Mathis, Gronstal, McCoy, Whitver, and Boettger. S.J. 862. |
2014-04-25 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 816. |
2014-04-25 | House | House conference committee appointed Watts, Pettengill, Landon, Kelley, and Hunter. H.J. 808. |
2014-04-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 808. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 855. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Senate insisted. S.J. 855. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 852. |
2014-04-24 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 799. |
2014-04-24 | House | House refused to concur in Senate amendment H-8288. H.J. 795. |
2014-04-21 | House | Senate amendment H-8288 filed. H.J. 773. |
2014-04-21 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 772. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 815. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 22. S.J. 814. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5156, as amended. S.J. 814. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Amendment S-5168 filed, adopted. S.J. 814. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5156. S.J. 788. |
2014-04-15 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 740. |
2014-04-15 | House | Passed House, ayes 53, nays 45. H.J. 738. |
2014-04-15 | House | Amendment H-8263 lost. H.J. 738. |
2014-04-15 | House | Amendment H-8264 adopted. H.J. 737. |
2014-04-15 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 736. |
2014-04-15 | House | Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-8262. H.J. 735. |
2014-04-15 | House | Ruled not germane amendment H-8262. H.J. 735. |
2014-04-15 | House | Point of order raised amendment H-8262 not germane. H.J. 735. |
2014-04-15 | House | Ruled not germane amendment H-8261. H.J. 735. |
2014-04-15 | House | Point of order raised amendment H-8261 not germane. H.J. 735. |
2014-04-15 | House | Ruled not germane amendment H-8260. H.J. 735. |
2014-04-15 | House | Point of order raised amendment H-8260 not germane. H.J. 735. |
2014-04-15 | House | Amendment H-8259 lost. H.J. 735. |
2014-04-15 | House | Committee amendment H-8228 as amended, adopted. H.J. 734. |
2014-04-15 | House | Amendment H-8257 to committee amendment H-8228 withdrawn. H.J. 734. |
2014-04-15 | House | Amendment H-8258 to committee amendment H-8228 out of order. H.J. 734. |
2014-04-15 | House | Amendment H-8276 to committee amendment H-8228 filed, adopted. H.J. 734. |
2014-04-14 | House | Amendments H-8257, H-8258, H-8259, H-8260, H-8261, H-8262, H-8263, and H-8264 filed. H.J. 721. |
2014-04-08 | House | Committee amendment H-8228 filed. H.J. 692. |
2014-04-08 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 691. |
2014-04-02 | House | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 658. |
2014-04-02 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 658. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 713. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 21. S.J. 711. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Amendment S-5122B adopted. S.J. 711. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Amendment S-5122A adopted. S.J. 710. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Amendment S-5125 to S-5122 filed, lost. S.J. 709. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 707. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Amendment S-5122 filed. S.J. 707. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 631. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 631. |