IA SF2310 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 851.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 851.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the underage possession or consumption of alcohol and providing penalties. (Formerly SF 2146.) Effective 7-1-14.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the underage possession or consumption of alcohol and providing penalties. (Formerly SF 2146.) Effective 7-1-14.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 851. |
2014-04-22 | House | Sent to Governor. S.J. 826. |
2014-04-22 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 826. |
2014-04-10 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 697. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 761. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays none. S.J. 757. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5136. S.J. 757. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5136. S.J. 736. |
2014-04-07 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 679. |
2014-04-07 | House | Passed House, ayes 89, nays 8. H.J. 678. |
2014-04-07 | House | Amendment H-8133 withdrawn. H.J. 678. |
2014-04-07 | House | Committee amendment H-8128 adopted. H.J. 678. |
2014-03-24 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2014-03-21 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 560. |
2014-03-18 | House | Amendment H-8133 filed. H.J. 535. |
2014-03-18 | House | Committee amendment H-8128 filed. H.J. 535. |
2014-03-18 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 534. |
2014-03-04 | House | Subcommittee, Klein, Fry, and R. Olson. H.J. 417. |
2014-03-04 | House | Read first time, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 385. |
2014-03-04 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 383. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 441. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 439. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 356. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 346. |