IA SF2118 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 868.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 868.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to domestic abuse protective orders and pets or companion animals owned or held by a petitioner, respondent, or minor child of the petitioner or respondent in a domestic abuse case. (Formerly SF 177.) Effective 7-1-14.
Title
A bill for an act relating to domestic abuse protective orders and pets or companion animals owned or held by a petitioner, respondent, or minor child of the petitioner or respondent in a domestic abuse case. (Formerly SF 177.) Effective 7-1-14.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 868. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 826. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 826. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 789. |
2014-04-16 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 758. |
2014-04-16 | House | Passed House, ayes 83, nays 10. H.J. 757. |
2014-04-16 | House | House receded. H.J. 756. |
2014-04-01 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 639. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 684. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate refused to concur with S-5093. S.J. 683. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5093. S.J. 641. |
2014-03-25 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 577. |
2014-03-26 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 601. |
2014-03-25 | House | Passed House, ayes 73, nays 22. H.J. 571. |
2014-03-25 | House | Amendment H-8120 out of order. H.J. 571. |
2014-03-25 | House | Amendment H-8136 adopted. H.J. 571. |
2014-03-25 | House | Ruled germane amendment H-8136. H.J. 570. |
2014-03-25 | House | Point of order raised amendment H-8136 not germane. H.J. 570. |
2014-03-21 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 560. |
2014-03-19 | House | Amendment H-8136 filed. H.J. 550. |
2014-03-13 | House | Amendment H-8120 filed. H.J. 497. |
2014-03-11 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 478. |
2014-02-27 | House | Subcommittee, Kaufmann, Baltimore, and Meyer. H.J. 370. |
2014-02-25 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 319. |
2014-02-24 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 309. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 317. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 316. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 206. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 202. |