IA HSB22 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF141
Note: Legislation replaced by SF280
Note: Legislation replaced by SF280
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF141.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF141.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the military service property tax exemption and credit and including applicability provisions.(See HF 141.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the military service property tax exemption and credit and including applicability provisions.(See HF 141.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-26 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF141. |
2023-01-25 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 191. |
2023-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-01-17 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2023 12:00PM House Lounge 2. |
2023-01-12 | House | Subcommittee: Gustafson, Isenhart and Rinker. H.J. 97. |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to Veterans Affairs. H.J. 94. |
2023-01-12 | House | By COMMITTEE ON VETERANS AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
HF141 (Replaced by) 2023-02-01 - Fiscal note.
SSB1138 (Related) 2023-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 280.
SF280 (Replaced by) 2023-02-15 - Fiscal note.
SSB1138 (Related) 2023-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 280.
SF280 (Replaced by) 2023-02-15 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB22 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB22.html |