IA HSB193 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF373
Note: Legislation replaced by HF536
Note: Legislation replaced by HF536
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.
Title
A study bill relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | Voted - Judiciary. |
2015-03-03 | House | 8:00AM; House Lounge Judiciary. |
2015-03-02 | House | Judiciary: Branhagen Chair,Gustafson, and Wolfe. |
2015-02-26 | House | In Judiciary |
2015-02-26 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1227 (Related) 2015-03-03 - Voted - Judiciary.
SF373 (Replaced by) 2015-03-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 675.
HF536 (Replaced by) 2015-04-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 814.
SF373 (Replaced by) 2015-03-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 675.
HF536 (Replaced by) 2015-04-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 814.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HSB193 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/HSB193.html |