IA HF589 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 413.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to an offense involving agricultural operations, and providing penalties, and including effective date provisions. Effective 3-2-12.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to an offense involving agricultural operations, and providing penalties, and including effective date provisions. Effective 3-2-12.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-02 Signed by Governor. H.J. 413.
2012-02-29 Sent to Governor. H.J. 398.
2012-02-29 Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 398.
2012-02-29 Message from House. S.J. 402.
2012-02-28 Immediate message. H.J. 368.
2012-02-28 Passed House, ayes 69, nays 28. H.J. 362.
2012-02-28 House concurred in Senate amendment H-8063. H.J. 362.
2012-02-28 Senate amendment H-8063. H.J. 362.
2012-02-28 Message from Senate. H.J. 358.
2012-02-28 Immediate message. S.J. 390.
2012-02-28 Passed Senate, ayes 40, nays 10. S.J. 389.
2012-02-28 Amendment S-3204 ruled out of order. S.J. 388.
2012-02-28 Amendment S-3203 ruled out of order. S.J. 388.
2012-02-28 Amendment S-3196 ruled out of order. S.J. 388.
2012-02-28 Amendment S-3194 ruled out of order. S.J. 388.
2012-02-28 Amendment S-3198 ruled out of order. S.J. 388.
2012-02-28 Amendment S-3197 ruled out of order. S.J. 388.
2012-02-28 Amendment S-3192 ruled out of order. S.J. 388.
2012-02-28 Amendment S-3209 ruled out of order. S.J. 388.
2012-02-28 Amendment S-3208 ruled out of order. S.J. 388.
2012-02-28 Amendment S-3206 ruled out of order. S.J. 388.
2012-02-28 Amendment S-3205 ruled out of order. S.J. 388.
2012-02-28 Amendment S-3202 ruled out of order. S.J. 388.
2012-02-28 Amendment S-3201 ruled out of order. S.J. 388.
2012-02-28 Amendment S-3200 ruled out of order. S.J. 388.
2012-02-28 Amendment S-3199 ruled out of order. S.J. 388.
2012-02-28 Amendment S-3195 ruled out of order. S.J. 388.
2012-02-28 Amendment S-3193 ruled out of order. S.J. 388.
2012-02-28 Amendment S-5004 adopted. S.J. 388.
2012-02-28 Amendment S-5030 filed, lost. S.J. 387.
2012-02-28 Amendment S-5029 filed, lost. S.J. 387.
2012-01-25 Deferred. S.J. 117.
2012-01-25 Amendment S-3341 withdrawn. S.J. 117.
2012-01-25 Amendment S-3297 withdrawn. S.J. 117.
2012-01-25 Amendment S-3286 withdrawn. S.J. 117.
2012-01-25 Amendment S-3377 withdrawn. S.J. 117.
2012-01-19 Amendment S-5004 filed. S.J. 98.
2011-12-31 END OF 2011 ACTIONS
2011-06-29 Amendment S-3377 filed. S.J. 1250.
2011-05-12 Amendment S-3341 filed. S.J. 1131.
2011-04-27 Amendment S-3297 filed. S.J. 1074.
2011-04-20 Amendment S-3286 filed. S.J. 1043.
2011-04-07 Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 936.
2011-03-31 Amendments S-3192, S-3193, S-3194, S-3195, S-3196, S-3197, S-3198, S-3199, S-3200, S-3201, S-3202, S-3203, S-3204, S-3205, S-3206, S-3208, and S-3209 filed. S.J. 855.
2011-03-30 Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 843.
2011-03-21 Read first time, referred to Agriculture. S.J. 727.
2011-03-21 Message from House. S.J. 727.
2011-03-17 Immediate message. H.J. 718.
2011-03-17 Passed House, ayes 66, nays 27. H.J. 717.
2011-03-27 Fiscal note. HCS.
2011-03-17 Amendments H-1286 and H-1263 withdrawn. H.J. 717.
2011-03-17 Amendment H-1278 adopted. H.J. 717.
2011-03-17 Amendments H-1318 and H-1319 withdrawn. H.J. 717.
2011-03-17 Amendment H-1283 out of order. H.J. 717.
2011-03-17 Amendment H-1375 adopted. H.J. 717.
2011-03-17 Amendments H-1288 and H-1304 withdrawn. H.J. 716.
2011-03-17 Amendments H-1320, H-1321, and H-1326 out of order. H.J. 716.
2011-03-17 Amendment H-1292 withdrawn. H.J. 716.
2011-03-16 Amendment H-1375 filed. H.J. 713.
2011-03-15 Amendments H-1304, H-1318, H-1319, H-1320, H-1321, and H-1326 filed. H.J. 686.
2011-03-14 Amendments H-1283, H-1286, H-1288, and H-1292 filed. H.J. 666.
2011-03-09 Amendments H-1263 and H-1278 filed. H.J. 648.
2011-03-08 Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 571.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback