IA HF520 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the policy administration of election and voter registration laws by the secretary of state, including the voter registration age, absentee voting, the provision of training space for election personnel, the candidate nomination filing requirements for merged area, school district, and city elections and related filing requirements, the filling of vacancies in certain city, county, and school district offices, and authorizing certain cities to conduct city elections by absentee ballot, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 22)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the policy administration of election and voter registration laws by the secretary of state, including the voter registration age, absentee voting, the provision of training space for election personnel, the candidate nomination filing requirements for merged area, school district, and city elections and related filing requirements, the filling of vacancies in certain city, county, and school district offices, and authorizing certain cities to conduct city elections by absentee ballot, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 22)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | House | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-04-05 | House | Referred to State Government. H.J. 760. |
2013-03-14 | House | Amendment H-1116 filed. H.J. 566. |
2013-03-12 | House | Amendment H-1079 filed. H.J. 526. |
2013-03-12 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 493. |