IA HF2463 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Item vetoed, signed by Governor H.J. 904.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Item vetoed, signed by Governor H.J. 904.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to appropriations for health and human services and veterans and including other related provisions and appropriations, extending the duration of county mental health and disabilities services fund per capita levy provisions, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. Item vetoed. Various effective dates, see bill.
Title
A bill for an act relating to appropriations for health and human services and veterans and including other related provisions and appropriations, extending the duration of county mental health and disabilities services fund per capita levy provisions, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. Item vetoed. Various effective dates, see bill.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Item vetoed, signed by Governor H.J. 904. |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 896. |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 896. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Chief Clerk's report on correction in engrossment. H.J. 843. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Message from Senate. H.J. 842. |
2014-04-29 | House | Immediate message. S.J. 882. |
2014-04-29 | House | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 24. S.J. 882. |
2014-04-29 | House | Conference committee report adopted. S.J. 881. |
2014-04-29 | House | Conference committee report filed. S.J. 881. |
2014-04-29 | House | Message from House. S.J. 881. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Immediate message. H.J. 837. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Passed House, ayes 86, nays 11. H.J. 835. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted. H.J. 835. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee report filed. H.J. 835. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 823. |
2014-04-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 776. |
2014-04-22 | House | House conference committee appointed Heaton, L. Miller, Fry,, Heddens, and Forbes. H.J. 776. |
2014-04-22 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 775. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 822. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate conference committee appointed, Hatch, Bolkcom, Ragan, Johnson, and Whitver. S.J. 822. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate insisted. S.J. 821. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 821. |
2014-04-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 775. |
2014-04-22 | House | House refused to concur in Senate amendment H-8289. H.J. 775. |
2014-04-22 | House | Senate amendment H-8289. H.J. 775. |
2014-04-22 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 775. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 818. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 22. S.J. 817. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Amendment S-5170 withdrawn. S.J. 817. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Amendment S-5171 out of order. S.J. 817. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Amendment S-5166 as amended, adopted. S.J. 817. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Amendment S-5169B withdrawn. S.J. 817. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Amendment S-5169A adopted. S.J. 817. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Amendments S-5169, S-5170, and S-5171 filed. S.J. 817. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 813. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Amendment S-5166 filed. S.J. 806. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 806. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Subcommittee, Hatch, Chapman, and Dvorsky. S.J. 785. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 764. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 764. |
2014-04-10 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 712. |
2014-04-10 | House | Passed House, ayes 51, nays 47. H.J. 710. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8239 filed, lost. H.J. 709. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8229 withdrawn. H.J. 708. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8253 as amended, adopted. H.J. 708. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8255 to amendment H-8253 filed, adopted. H.J. 708. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8256 to amendment H-8253 filed, adopted. H.J. 708. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8253 filed. H.J. 708. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8240 filed, lost. H.J. 708. |
2014-04-10 | House | Motion prevailed and amendment H-8230 withdrawn. H.J. 708. |
2014-04-10 | House | Motion to withdraw amendment H-8230 H.J. 708. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8221 withdrawn. H.J. 707. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8218 adopted. H.J. 707. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8227 withdrawn. H.J. 707. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8246 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 707. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8233 withdrawn. H.J. 707. |
2014-04-10 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 707. |
2014-04-10 | House | Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-8252. H.J. 706. |
2014-04-10 | House | Ruled not germane amendment H-8252. H.J. 706. |
2014-04-10 | House | Point of order raised amendment H-8252 not germane. H.J. 706. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8252 filed. H.J. 706. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8235 adopted. H.J. 706. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8236 lost. H.J. 705. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8245 filed, lost. H.J. 704. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8249 lost. H.J. 704. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8249 filed. H.J. 703. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8226 adopted. H.J. 703. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8244 lost. H.J. 702. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8244 filed. H.J. 701. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8243 lost. H.J. 701. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8243 filed. H.J. 700. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8238 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 700. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8251 filed, adopted. H.J. 700. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8242 lost. H.J. 700. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8242 filed. H.J. 699. |
2014-04-10 | House | Amendment H-8241 filed, lost. H.J. 698. |
2014-04-09 | House | Amendments H-8235 and H-8236 filed. H.J. 695. |
2014-04-08 | House | Amendments H-8226, H-8227, H-8229, H-8230, and H-8233 filed. H.J. 692. |
2014-04-07 | House | Amendment H-8221 filed. H.J. 681. |
2014-04-07 | House | Amendment H-8218 filed. H.J. 680. |
2014-04-03 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 665. |