IA HF2082 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Withdrawn. H.J. 725.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Withdrawn. H.J. 725.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing an individual income tax credit for qualified adoption expenses paid or incurred in connection with certain adoptions and including retroactive applicability provisions. (See Cmte. Bill HF 2268)
Title
A bill for an act providing an individual income tax credit for qualified adoption expenses paid or incurred in connection with certain adoptions and including retroactive applicability provisions. (See Cmte. Bill HF 2268)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 725. |
2014-02-06 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2014-02-03 | House | Subcommittee, Hess, Dawson, and Fry. H.J. 144. |
2014-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 125. |