HI SB573 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes a state income tax credit for certain expenses paid or incurred by educators. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB573 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax Credit; Certain Expenses; Supplementary Classroom Materials

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-19SenateReceived notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41).
2014-02-18HouseHouse Conferee(s) discharged.
2013-12-18 Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
2013-04-25SenateThe conference committee deferred the measure.
2013-04-23SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 3:00PM in conference room 329.
2013-04-18HouseReceived notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709).
2013-04-18SenateSenator(s) Kidani replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s).
2013-04-17SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 3:00PM in conference room 329.
2013-04-16SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-13 3:00PM in conference room 329.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Takumi, Luke Co-Chairs; Ohno, Fale.
2013-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
2013-04-15SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Tokuda, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Slom.
2013-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 608).
2013-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2013-04-09SenateDeferred until 04-11-13.
2013-04-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 466).
2013-04-05HousePassed Third Reading with Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Say, Tokioka excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1475), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-04-02HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Ward.
2013-03-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2013-03-18HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, McKelvey, Oshiro excused (3).
2013-03-18HouseReported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 994) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2013-03-11HouseThe committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Choy, Ichiyama, Cheape, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Nakashima, Takai.
2013-03-07HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 03-11-13 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
2013-03-07HouseReferred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 30
2013-03-07HousePass First Reading
2013-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 171) in amended form (SD 2).
2013-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
2013-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 737) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2013-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2013-02-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2013-02-12SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 201) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2013-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Slom.
2013-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-13 3:00PM in conference room 414.
2013-01-22SenateReferred to EDU, WAM.
2013-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback