HI SB2478 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progress
Action: 2014-04-30 - Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Updates the scope of practice for chiropractic to reflect standards, practices, and terminology accepted by the National Board of Chiropractic Examiners. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chiropractic; Scope of Practice

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-30HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720).
2014-04-29HouseRecommitted to Conference committee as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Har, Jordan, McDermott, Oshiro, Takai voting no and Representative(s) Ito excused.
2014-04-29SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Nishihara, L. Thielen, Wakai . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Green. 0 Excused: none.
2014-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-29-14.
2014-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 135-14) as amended in (CD 1).
2014-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14.
2014-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 135-14).
2014-04-25HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, McKelvey, Morikawa, Jordan; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Creagan; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2014-04-25SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi.
2014-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 4:40PM in conference room 229.
2014-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 9:10AM in conference room 229.
2014-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 2:40PM in conference room 229.
2014-04-23SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 9:10AM in conference room 229.
2014-04-23SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 5:10PM in conference room 229.
2014-04-22SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-14 5:10PM in conference room 229.
2014-04-21SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-14 1:00PM in conference room 229.
2014-04-21SenateReceived notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 696).
2014-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Added: Representative Morikawa added as Co-Chair.
2014-04-17HouseRe-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 58
2014-04-17SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-14 1:00PM in conference room 229.
2014-04-16SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-14 1:00PM in conference room 229.
2014-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685).
2014-04-14HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 674).
2014-04-14HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Belatti, McKelvey Co-Chairs; Creagan, Jordan, McDermott Members .
2014-04-14SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Taniguchi, Slom Members.
2014-04-10HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670).
2014-04-10SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2014-04-10SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 579).
2014-04-08HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2014-04-04HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-08-14.
2014-04-04HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1661-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2014-04-02HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Har.
2014-03-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 04-02-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325.
2014-03-21HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3).
2014-03-21HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1133-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2014-03-19HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Carroll, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Oshiro.
2014-03-14HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-19-14 10:30AM in conference room 329.
2014-03-14HouseThe committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-19-14 at 10:30AM.
2014-03-07HouseBill scheduled for decision-making on Friday, 03-14-14 9:30AM in conference room 329.
2014-03-07HouseThe committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-14-14 at 9:30am.
2014-03-05HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-07-14 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
2014-03-04HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 27
2014-02-28HousePass First Reading
2014-02-27HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 42).
2014-02-27SenatePassed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Ruderman). Transmitted to House.
2014-02-19SenateOne Day Notice 02-27-14.
2014-02-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading.
2014-02-19SenateReported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2476) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2014-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai.
2014-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-14 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2014-01-21SenateReferred to CPN.
2014-01-21SenatePassed First Reading.
2014-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1831 (Same As) 2014-02-26 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback