HI SB2322 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progress
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates a capital infrastructure tax credit for tenants who are displaced by the Kapalama container terminal project. Allows allocations of the capital infrastructure tax credit to a partner under a partnership agreement even if the allocation does not have substantial economic effect. Recaptures an unspecified percentage of the capital infrastructure tax credit if the qualified infrastructure tenant does not meet certain conditions at the close of any taxable year. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Capital Infrastructure Tax Credit; Kapalama Container Terminal Project; Displaced Tenants

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-06HouseReferred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 28
2014-03-06HousePass First Reading
2014-03-04HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 157) in amended form (SD 2).
2014-03-04SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Galuteria). Transmitted to House.
2014-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14.
2014-02-28SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2755) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2014-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2014-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-14 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2014-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2014-02-14SenateReported from EGH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2405) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2014-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, Chun Oakland, English, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Wakai.
2014-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-14 2:45PM in conference room 016.
2014-01-21SenateReferred to EGH, WAM.
2014-01-17SenatePassed First Reading.
2014-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1702 (Same As) 2014-07-03 - Act 200, 7/1/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1303).

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback