HI SB2188 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants adopted individuals who have attained eighteen years of age, unfettered access to the adopted individual's sealed adoption records. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Adoption Records; Open Access
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2138) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Taniguchi. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-04-14 1:00PM in conference room 016. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-14 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDL. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Introduced. |