HI HB836 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB836
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to the Hawaii Health Systems Corporation to retain the services of a consultant to prepare a financial sustainability plan for the Hawaii Health Systems Corporation and its member regions. Appropriates moneys.
Title
Relating To The Financial Sustainability Of The Hawaii Health Systems Corporation.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Garrett [D] | Rep. Kirstin Kahaloa [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Jenna Takenouchi [D] |
Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Terez Amato [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-15 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2023-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-15-23 9:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB836 (Carry Over) 2023-02-15 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=836&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB836_.HTM |