HI HB2576 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progress
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:20 pm in Conference Room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a special fund for the development of charter school facilities. Establishes an income tax credit for taxpayers who make contributions to the development of charter school facilities. Appropriates funds for the Hawaii charter school facility development special fund. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hawaii Charter School Facility Development Special Fund; Tax Credit; Appropriation ($)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:20 pm in Conference Room 329.
2014-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 4:20PM in Conference Room 329.
2014-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 2:00pm in Conference Room 329.
2014-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 11:30AM in conference room 329.
2014-04-21HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-24-14 2:00PM in conference room 329.
2014-04-16HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-21-14 2:00PM in conference room 329.
2014-04-15HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-16-14 2:00PM in conference room 329.
2014-04-14HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673).
2014-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684).
2014-04-14HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Woodson Co-Chairs; Fale Member.
2014-04-14SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Ige Co-Chair; Kidani Member.
2014-04-11SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676).
2014-04-10HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2014-04-08HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 658) in amended form (SD 2).
2014-04-08SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Solomon, Taniguchi . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2014-04-03Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14.
2014-04-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3271) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2014-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland.
2014-03-25SenateThe committee on WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 03-28-14 9:35AM in conference room 211.
2014-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-14 9:35AM in conference room 211.
2014-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-14 9:15AM in conference room 211.
2014-03-20SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2014-03-20SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2969) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2014-03-17SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Gabbard, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2014-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-14 3:00PM in conference room 414.
2014-03-06SenateReferred to EDU, WAM.
2014-03-04SenatePassed First Reading.
2014-03-04SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 196).
2014-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Har, Thielen, Woodson excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
2014-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 737-14), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2014-02-26HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Ward.
2014-02-24HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-26-14 5:00PM in House conference room 308.
2014-02-11HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Hanohano voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll excused (2).
2014-02-11HouseReported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 297-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2014-02-03HouseThe committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Awana, Ichiyama, Say, Matsumoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Choy, Hanohano; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takai.
2014-01-31HouseBroadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2014-01-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 02-03-14 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
2014-01-27HouseReferred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 7
2014-01-23HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback