HI HB2529 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the connector legislative oversight committee. Establishes the Hawaii health insurance exchange special fund. Beginning January 1, 2015, assesses a Hawaii health insurance exchange sustainability fee of no more than .345 per cent of the premiums derived from the sale of comprehensive medical insurance plans, including dental plans, in the State, to be deposited into the Hawaii health insurance exchange special fund. Notes that the current two percent surcharge authorized by the connector on plans sold through the connector shall cease to be collected once the Hawaii health insurance exchange sustainability fee is instituted. Requires the board of directors of the connector to prepare and submit to the legislative oversight committee a fully documented biennial sustainability plan budget request for the connector. Permits the legislature to annually appropriate funds collected from the sustainability fee to the Hawaii health insurance exchange. Clarifies that the connector must submit the results of the connector's annual audit to the legislature. Amends the composition and procedures of the board of directors of the Hawaii health connector. Appropriates funds to the Hawaii health insurance exchange special fund. Requires the Hawaii health insurance exchange special fund to reimburse the general fund over a five-year period once the sustainability fee is instituted and collected and the sustainability plan is adopted. Effective 7/1/2112. (SD1)
Title
Health; Hawaii Health Connector; Hawaii Health Insurance Exchange Special Fund; Connector Legislative Oversight Committee; Hawaii Health Insurance Exchange Sustainability Fee; Sustainability Plan Budget Request; Board of Directors; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-03-14 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-14 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-14 9:20AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Reported from CPN/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3021) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Nishihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Slom. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Nishihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom. |
2014-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-18-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPN/HTH, WAM. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-14-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 364). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with Representative(s) Awana, Cullen, Hanohano, Har, Ichiyama, Jordan, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Fukumoto, Ito, Johanson, Matsumoto, McDermott, Thielen voting no (7) and Representative(s) Ward, Wooley excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 904-14) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Johanson, Jordan, Tokioka, Fukumoto, Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2014-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-27-14 2:00PM in conference room 308. |
2014-02-26 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-14 at 2:00PM. |
2014-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-26-14 11:15AM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-14 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fale, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Har, Johanson, Jordan, Matsumoto, Oshiro, Say, Thielen, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Creagan, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5). |
2014-02-14 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 526-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-02-13 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Evans, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ito, Oshiro, Thielen; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Har. |
2014-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-13-14 11:30AM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-14 at 11:30am. |
2014-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-14, 2:00PM. |
2014-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-10-14 5:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Awana, Matsumoto, Cullen, Fale, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Har, Johanson, Jordan, Oshiro, Thielen, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Yamane excused (2). |
2014-02-07 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 240-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2014-02-05 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Carroll, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2014-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-05-14 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2014-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-14 at 8:30AM. |
2014-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 01-31-14 11:00AM in conference room 329. |
2014-01-29 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 01-31-14 at 11:00am. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2014-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 01-29-14 8:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |