HI HB2170 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progress
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 5:00PM in conference room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides an income tax credit for costs incurred for new hotel construction. Effective 7/1/2030. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

New Hotel Construction; Income Tax Credit

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 5:00PM in conference room 309.
2014-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 4:30PM in conference room 312.
2014-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 2:30PM in conference room 312.
2014-04-23HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 10:00AM in conference room 312.
2014-04-21HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-23-14 4:30PM in conference room 312.
2014-04-17HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-21-14 4:30PM in conference room 312.
2014-04-15HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-17-14 10:00AM in conference room 312.
2014-04-14HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673).
2014-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684).
2014-04-14HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Brower, Luke Co-Chairs; Tokioka, Johanson Members.
2014-04-14SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Kahele Chair; Ige Co-Chair; Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Slom Members.
2014-04-11SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676).
2014-04-10HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2014-04-08HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 610) in amended form (SD 2).
2014-04-08SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2014-04-03Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14.
2014-04-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3215) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2014-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland.
2014-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-14 9:15AM in conference room 211.
2014-03-20SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2014-03-20SenateReported from TSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2960) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2014-03-17SenateThe committee(s) on TSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ige, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2014-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on TSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-14 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2014-03-06SenateReferred to TSM, WAM.
2014-03-06SenatePassed First Reading.
2014-03-06SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 307).
2014-03-04HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Hanohano, Ing, Jordan, Lowen, Oshiro, Wooley voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2014-02-28HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14.
2014-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 880-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2014-02-25HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2014-02-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-14 11:15AM in House conference room 308.
2014-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Ing, Jordan, Wooley voting aye with reservations; Choy, Hanohano, Oshiro voting no (3) and Awana, Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (4).
2014-02-13HouseReported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 390-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2014-02-03HouseThe committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Cachola, Awana, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Choy; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takai.
2014-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Monday, 02-03-14 9:30AM in House conference room 312.
2014-01-23HouseReferred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 5
2014-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2014-01-21HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback