HI HB1870 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progress
Action: 2014-03-28 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a nonrefundable income tax credit for taxpayers who purchase residential backup generators. Effective 07/01/2030. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential Backup Generator Tax Credit

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-28SenateThe committee on WAM deferred the measure.
2014-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-28-14 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2014-03-17SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-14 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2014-03-06SenateReferred to WAM.
2014-03-06SenatePassed First Reading.
2014-03-06SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 262).
2014-03-04HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Lowen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Wooley excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2014-02-28HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Luke, Nakashima, Thielen, Woodson excused (5).
2014-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 684-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2014-02-12HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2014-02-10HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-12-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2014-01-21HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 3
2014-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2014-01-17HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback