HI HB1651 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Unless preempted by federal law, requires the collection of use taxes by sellers of tangible personal property who enter into agreements under which a person in the State refers potential purchasers to the seller, including by an internet link or web site, or performs related services in the State on behalf of the seller. Effective July 1, 2030. (HB1651 HD1)
Title
Use Tax; Internet Sales; Out-of-State Sellers; Affiliates
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 232). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Evans, Fale, Fukumoto, Johanson, Matsumoto, McDermott, Ohno, Thielen, Ward voting no (9) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 785-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-19 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Johanson; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Ward; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Tokioka. |
2014-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-19-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Fukumoto, Johanson, Matsumoto, McDermott, Thielen, Ward voting no (7) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (3). |
2014-02-14 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 457-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-02-11 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen. |
2014-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-11-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-17 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-13 | House | Prefiled |