HI HB1383 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 273, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1393).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 273, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1393).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the expungement of criminal records pertaining solely to the possession of three grams or less of marijuana. Decriminalizes the possession of three grams or less of marijuana and establishes that the possession is a violation punishable by a monetary fine of $130. Establishes a marijuana evaluation task force to make recommendations on changing marijuana use penalties and outcomes in the State. (HB1383 CD1)
Title
Relating To Marijuana.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | Senate | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 273, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1393). |
2019-07-12 | House | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 273, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1393). |
2019-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Johanson voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Eli, Har, Kitagawa, Kong, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Say, Tokioka, Ward, Yamane voting no (16) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye . 3 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella, Harimoto, Moriwaki. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 202). |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 202) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2019-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Luke, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 3:20PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 3:20PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 3:30PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 948). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Nishihara, English Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Luke Co-Chairs; Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen. |
2019-04-15 | House | Re-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 52 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 855) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Fevella, Harimoto, Moriwaki). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kidani). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2008) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Harimoto, Moriwaki; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye, Taniguchi. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-19 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from JDC/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1429) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to JDC/PSM, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 502). |
2019-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Johanson, B. Kobayashi voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Eli, Har, Kitagawa, Kong, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Say, Tokioka, Ward, Yamane voting no (16) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-05 | House | Floor amendment adopted as amended HD 2 with none voting no and Representative(s) Cachola excused. |
2019-03-05 | House | Floor Amendment No. 1 offered by Rep. Lee. |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Cachola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Har, Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Tokioka, Ward voting no (8) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 961) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-27 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey, Say, Yamane. |
2019-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-19. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-26-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-22 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-19. |
2019-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-22-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-19 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-22-19. |
2019-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-19-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 02-19-19. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19. |
2019-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-04-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-01 | House | Re-referred to JUD, referral sheet 10 |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |