GA SR99 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to provide that no law or rule or regulation shall compel any person, employer, or health care provider to participate in any health care system and to authorize persons and employers to pay directly for lawful health care services without penalties or fines; to provide a short title; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
"Health Care Freedom of Choice Constitutional Amendment" -CA
Sponsors
Sen. Judson Hill [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] | Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] |
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/38166 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20132014/129100 |