GA SR875 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Joint Study Committee on the Property Tax Digest Impact on Education Funding; and for other purposes.
Title
Property Tax Digest Impact on Education Funding; create Joint Study Committee
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Hill [R] | Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] | Sen. Brandon Beach [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Rep. David Knight [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #763 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #793 (Y: 174 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #523 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #793 (Y: 174 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #523 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-22 | Act 599 | |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub |
2014-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-03-03 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate Hopper |