GA SR84 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Act 761
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Act 761
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to authorize the General Assembly to allow state entities to enter into multiyear rental agreements without obligating present funds for the full obligation to the state under the full term of such agreements; to provide for procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
General Assembly; authorize state entities to enter into multiyear rental agreements; procedures, conditions, and limitations-CA
Sponsors
Sen. Earl Carter [R] | Sen. William Jackson [R] | Sen. Chip Rogers [R] | Sen. Cecil Staton [R] |
Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Tommie Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #852 - Agree To House Substitute (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House Vote #796 - Adopt (Y: 146 N: 14 NV: 11 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #29 - Adoption Of Constitutional Amendment (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House Vote #796 - Adopt (Y: 146 N: 14 NV: 11 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #29 - Adoption Of Constitutional Amendment (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Act 761 | |
2012-05-03 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-05 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-27 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-26 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-10 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-02-23 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-22 | House First Readers | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-02-10 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-02-09 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-01 | Senate Read and Referred |