GA SB8 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 9, Chapter 21 of Title 15, Title 16, and Article 1 of Chapter 5 of Title 49 of the O.C.G.A., relating to limitations of actions, payment and disposition of fines and forfeitures, crimes and offenses, and children and youth services, respectively, so as to make provisions for children who have been sexually exploited; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and contingent effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and Offenses: children who have been sexually exploited; make provisions; create Safe Harbor for Sexually Exploited Children Fund Commission
Sponsors
Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Gloria Butler [D] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Judson Hill [R] |
Rep. Tom Weldon [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #350 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Vote #355 (Y: 150 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #28 (Y: 52 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Vote #355 (Y: 150 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #28 (Y: 52 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-05 | Act 95 | |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2015-03-31 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-31 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-17 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
2014-12-12 | Senate | Senate Prefiled |