GA SB65 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Enrolled on March 26 2014 - 75% progress
Action: 2014-03-26 - Senate Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 37 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to mental health, so as to authorize a licensed professional counselor to perform certain acts which physicians, psychologists, and others are authorized to perform regarding emergency examinations of persons who are mentally ill or alcoholic or drug dependent; to define certain terms; to require a licensed professional counselor to secure certification to perform certain acts from the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Disabilities; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental Health; authorize licensed professional counselor to perform certain acts; secure certification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-20 - Senate Vote #767 (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House Vote #723 (Y: 119 N: 38 NV: 13 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate Vote #29 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-26SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2014-03-20SenateSenate Agrees House Amend or Sub
2014-03-07HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2014-03-07HouseHouse Third Readers
2014-02-21HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2013-03-28HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2013-03-26HouseHouse Postponed
2013-03-25HouseHouse Postponed
2013-03-22HouseHouse Postponed
2013-03-14HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2013-02-13HouseHouse Second Readers
2013-02-12HouseHouse First Readers
2013-02-11SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2013-02-11SenateSenate Third Read
2013-02-07SenateSenate Read Second Time
2013-02-06SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2013-01-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2013-01-18SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback