GA SB61 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 5 of Chapter 4 of Title 10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to self-service storage facilities, so as to change the short title; to provide for definitions; to change the due date for monthly rental payments; to provide procedures for sending notice of default; to provide for print or electronic publication of notice of public sale of property; to provide for limitations on an owner's liability; to provide for towing of motor vehicles and watercraft; to provide for delay in filing an owner's lien if an occupant is deployed overseas by the armed services; to exempt certain rental agreements; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Georgia Self-service Storage Facility Act of 2013" change the due date for monthly rental payments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-28 - Senate Vote #397 (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House Vote #300 (Y: 159 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate Vote #63 (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-01 Effective Date
2013-05-06 Act 172
2013-05-06SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2013-04-09SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2013-03-28SenateSenate Agrees House Amend or Sub
2013-03-14HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2013-03-14HouseHouse Third Readers
2013-03-12HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2013-02-27HouseHouse Second Readers
2013-02-26HouseHouse First Readers
2013-02-25SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2013-02-25SenateSenate Third Read
2013-02-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2013-02-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2013-01-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2013-01-17SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback