GA SB377 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on February 11 2014 - 25% progress
Action: 2014-02-24 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state government, so as to provide for the preservation of religious freedom; to provide for a short title; to provide for definitions; to provide for penalties; to provide for the granting of relief; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Preservation of Religious Freedom Act"

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-24SenateSenate Read Second Time
2014-02-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2014-02-17SenateSenate Read and Referred
2014-02-11SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback