GA SB367 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 50-8-84 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to composition of membership of metropolitan area planning and development commissions and redistricting of areas removed from jurisdiction of existing commission, so as to change the eligibility to be a member of a commission; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Metropolitan Area Planning and Development Commissions; change the eligibility to be a member of a commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #766 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #824 (Y: 136 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #502 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #824 (Y: 136 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #502 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-10 | Act 462 | |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub |
2014-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2014-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-25 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hopper |