GA SB350 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub As Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub As Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Department of Human Services, so as to provide for the bidding out of child welfare services state wide through contracts with community based providers; to provide for definitions; to provide for qualifications for contractors; to provide for contract standards; to provide for a review; to provide for procedures; to provide for related matters; to provide for a contingent effective date; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Human Services, Dept.of; bidding out of child welfare services state wide through contracts with community based providers
Sponsors
Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] | Sen. Brandon Beach [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] |
Sen. Freddie Sims [D] | Rep. Carlton Rogers [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #760 (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #797 (Y: 88 N: 83 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #798 (Y: 111 N: 57 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #805 (Y: 104 N: 70 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #471 (Y: 19 N: 30 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #472 (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #797 (Y: 88 N: 83 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #798 (Y: 111 N: 57 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #805 (Y: 104 N: 70 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #471 (Y: 19 N: 30 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #472 (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub As Amended |
2014-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted Reconsidered Bill/Res By Substitute |
2014-03-18 | House | House Reconsidered |
2014-03-18 | House | House Third Reading Lost |
2014-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-19 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senate Hopper |