GA SB342 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 24-12-21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to disclosure of AIDS confidential information, so as to provide for disclosure of a person's HIV status to certain health care providers; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Evidence; disclosure of a person's HIV status to certain health care providers
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Don Balfour [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Rep. Barbara Sims [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #776 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House Vote #728 (Y: 147 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #476 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House Vote #728 (Y: 147 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #476 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-29 | Act 640 | |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub |
2014-03-10 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2014-03-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senate Hopper |