GA SB326 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-29 - Veto V2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-29 - Veto V2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 20-3-202 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the creation, membership, officers, compensation, expenses, organization, duration, and quorum of the Private Colleges and Universities Authority, so as to authorize the authority to meet by teleconference and other methods permitted by law; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Private Colleges and Universities Authority; authorize the authority to meet by teleconference and other methods permitted by law
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jeffares [R] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] | Sen. Cecil Staton [R] | Sen. Earl Carter [R] |
Sen. Francis Millar [R] | Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] | Rep. Dale Rutledge [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #752 (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Vote #883 (Y: 163 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #826 (Y: 51 N: 112 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #827 (Y: 168 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #544 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Vote #883 (Y: 163 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #826 (Y: 51 N: 112 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #827 (Y: 168 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #544 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Veto V2 | |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | House | House Agrees Senate Amend or Sub |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub As Amended |
2014-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2014-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Senate Hopper |