GA SB281 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-29 - Veto V1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-29 - Veto V1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 1 of Chapter 18 of Title 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state employees' health insurance plan, so as to require that a high deductible health care plan with a health savings account be offered as an option for persons covered under the state employees' health insurance plan; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Employees; require a high deductible health care plan with health savings account; offered as an option
Sponsors
Sen. Judson Hill [R] | Sen. Ed Setzler [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #818 (Y: 167 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #531 (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #541 (Y: 40 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #531 (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #541 (Y: 40 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Veto V1 | |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2014-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Senate Hopper |