GA SB240 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 9 of Title 3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the sale of alcoholic beverages by passenger carriers, nonprofit organizations, and hotels and motels, so as to provide for the licensing of the production of distilled spirits for educational purposes by non-profit museums; to create a definition of non-profit museum; to provide a permit fee; to provide limitations of such permits; to waive certain alcohol tax and bond requirements for non-profit museums; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages; provide for the licensing of the production of distilled spirits; educational purposes by non-profit museums
Sponsors
Sen. Hunter Hill [R] | Rep. Rich Golick [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #774 (Y: 42 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Vote #736 (Y: 151 N: 13 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #433 (Y: 43 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Vote #736 (Y: 151 N: 13 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #433 (Y: 43 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-26 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-26 | Act 631 | |
2014-04-26 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub |
2014-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-02-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-05 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |