GA SB167 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - House Committee Unfavorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - House Committee Unfavorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the O.C.G.A., relating to competencies and core curriculum, so as to declare certain actions void ab initio relating to adoption of certain curricula; to prohibit state education agencies from entering into any commitments relating to the federal Race to the Top program; to require hearings and public input prior to adoption of state-wide competencies and content standards; to limit the compilation and sharing of personal student and teacher data; to prohibit the expenditure of funds for a state-wide longitudinal data system except for administrative needs and federal grant compliance; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; declare certain actions void ab initio relating to adoption of certain curricula
Sponsors
Sen. William Ligon [R] | Sen. Barry Loudermilk [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Sen. Hunter Hill [R] | Sen. Tommie Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #508 (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | House | House Committee Unfavorably Reported |
2014-03-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Hopper |