GA SB134 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 16-13-21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions relative to controlled substances, so as to revise the definition of "prescriber"; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Controlled Substances; revise the definition of "prescriber"
Sponsors
Sen. Earl Carter [R] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Nan Orrock [D] |
Sen. Jesse Stone [R] | Rep. Tom Weldon [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - House Vote #885 (Y: 144 N: 19 NV: 14 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #800 (Y: 51 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #349 (Y: 35 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - House Vote #355 (Y: 155 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #79 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #800 (Y: 51 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #349 (Y: 35 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - House Vote #355 (Y: 155 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #79 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-21 | Act 550 | |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2014-03-20 | House | House Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2014-03-20 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed 3rd, 141st, 164th |
2014-03-20 | House | House Insists |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed 45th, 1st, 9th |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Insists |
2013-03-28 | House | House Disagrees Senate Amend/Sub |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub As Amended |
2013-03-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2013-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-22 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2013-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hopper |