GA HR3 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-14 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-14 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION expressing profound regret for Georgia's role in slavery and expressing intent that this resolution shall not be used in, or be the basis of, any type of litigation; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia's role in slavery; expressing profound regret
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-01-13 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-12 | House | House Hopper |
2014-12-11 | House | House Prefiled |