GA HR2 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-29 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-29 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to provide term limits for members of the Senate and members of the House of Representatives; to provide for related matters; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
Senate and House of Representatives; members; provide term limits - CA
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Caldwell [R] | Rep. John Pezold [R] | Rep. Scot Turner [R] | Rep. David Stover [R] |
Rep. Wesley Cantrell [R] | Rep. Jason Spencer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-27 | House | House Hopper |
2014-12-05 | House | House Prefiled |