GA HB930 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions regarding state government; to provide that the General Assembly shall adopt standards and instructions for Article V convention delegates; to provide for the revocation of a resolution calling for an Article V convention under certain circumstances; to prohibit certain votes by delegates and alternate delegates; to provide for penalties; to provide for an advisory group and its composition, powers, duties, and procedures; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
General Assembly; adopt standards and instructions for Article V convention delegates; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Barr [R] | Rep. Buzz Brockway [R] | Rep. Josh Clark [R] | Rep. Kevin Cooke [R] |
Rep. Matthew Ramsey [R] | Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #746 (Y: 42 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Vote #878 (Y: 102 N: 61 NV: 14 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #654 (Y: 34 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #688 (Y: 115 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Vote #878 (Y: 102 N: 61 NV: 14 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #654 (Y: 34 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #688 (Y: 115 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-15 | Act 528 | |
2014-04-15 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-27 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | House | House Agrees Senate Amend or Sub |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-02-26 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2014-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-06 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-05 | House | House Hopper |