GA HB905 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Veto V8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Veto V8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to incorporate the City of Brookhaven in DeKalb County, approved April 16, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 5527), as amended, so as to provide for legislative findings and intent; to change the corporate limits of the city; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Brookhaven, City of; provide for legislative findings and intent; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #463 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Vote #483 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Vote #483 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Veto V8 | |
2014-04-24 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-25 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-06 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-06 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-04 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-03 | House | House Hopper |