GA HB903 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progress
Action: 2010-06-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-13-51 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to county and municipal tax levies on hotels and motels and other public accommodations, so as to revise provisions relating to a levy at the rate of 7 percent by certain counties and municipalities; to provide that, where such tax was levied for the purpose of funding a multipurpose domed stadium facility and is subject to a stated expiration date, the expiration date may be extended under certain circumstances; to provide for extension for purposes of funding a successor facility upon certification of certain conditions by a state authority; to provide for expenditure through a contract with the state authority; to provide for a new extended expiration date; to provide for the protection of bondholders; to provide for other related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County and municipal tax levies; fund domed stadium; revise provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-13 - Senate Vote #713 - Passage As Amended (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-03 Effective Date
2010-06-03 Act 606
2010-06-03 House Date Signed by Governor
2010-05-03 House Sent to Governor
2010-04-14 House Agree Senate Amend or Sub
2010-04-13 Senate Transmits House
2010-04-13 Senate Passed/Adopted
2010-04-13 Senate Third Read
2010-04-12 Senate Read Second Time
2010-04-01 Senate Committee Favorably Reported
2010-03-09 Senate Read and Referred
2010-03-08 House Passed/Adopted
2010-03-08 House Third Readers
2010-02-11 House Committee Favorably Reported
2010-01-13 House Second Readers
2010-01-12 House First Readers
2010-01-06 House Prefiled

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback